Prendergast, Peter Jude (CPSO#: 33174)

Current Status: Active Member - CPSO Staff as of 07 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CPSO
80 College St
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Phone: (416) 967-2600 Ext. 453
Fax: (416) 967-2616
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Prendergast Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Prendergast ( CPSO# 33174 )

Business Address:
CPSO
80 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Phone Number: (416) 967-2600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JUDE PRENDERGAST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRENDERGAST is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1982