Prentice, Robert Stuart Arthur (CPSO#: 21018)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 15 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002