Preradovic, Nikola (CPSO#: 25406)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 04 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of thier medical record may contact: Rebecca Medical Walk-In Clinic 170 Rebecca Street Oakville ON L6K 1J6 Tel: 905-849-0986
Date Received: 02 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jan 2018