Pressnail, Bryn Lloyd (CPSO#: 30836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Simcoe Muskoka
Regional Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43333
Fax: (705) 739-5619
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bryn Pressnail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Pressnail ( CPSO# 30836 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 13 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRYN LLOYD PRESSNAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRESSNAIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1979