Prest, Marcia Elaine Howe (CPSO#: 31931)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1989