Prica, Anca Alexandra (CPSO#: 84695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
OPG 6-421
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2249
Fax: (416) 946-4407
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
12th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-2249
Fax: (416) 946-6546
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anca Prica Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Prica ( CPSO# 84695 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
OPG 6-421 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2249

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANCA ALEXANDRA PRICA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRICA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010