Price, Charles Macdonald (CPSO#: 52582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4466
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles MacDonald Price Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Price ( CPSO# 52582 )

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4466

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES MACDONALD PRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRICE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1987