Price, David Harold (CPSO#: 77566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albion Finch Medical Centre
Unit 106
1620 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 4B4
Phone: (416) 741-1500
Fax: (416) 741-1506
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David H. Price Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Price ( CPSO# 77566 )

Business Address:
Albion Finch Medical Centre
Unit 106
1620 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 4B4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID HAROLD PRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRICE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004