Price, David John (CPSO#: 61427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 575-1744
Fax: (905) 575-0779
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Maternity Centre of Hamilton
3rd floor, DBHC
1280Main St West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: (905) 528-5553
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David J. Price Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Price ( CPSO# 61427 )

Business Address:
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 575-1744

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN PRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRICE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1999