Price, Joel Elliot (CPSO#: 80765)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2012