Price, Laura Annaleis (CPSO#: 73484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Victoria Hospital, London Health
Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 76538
Fax: (519) 667-6769
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Urgent Care
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6000
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Department Of Emergency Medicine
University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  L6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55005
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Price Pringle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pringle ( CPSO# 68246 )
Dr. L. Price ( CPSO# 73484 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Urgent Care
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA ANNALEIS PRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRICE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004