Price, Nigel John (CPSO#: 57200)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Jul 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Sep 2001