Prichard, Hugh Leslie (CPSO#: 58883)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh Prichard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 18 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Feb 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2014