Pridham, Jeremy Norman (CPSO#: 56608)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Mar 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2003