Priesnitz, Alisha Ann (CPSO#: 82422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Family Health Team
Unit D2
1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone: (613) 546-9721
Fax: (613) 546-2799
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alisha Priesnitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Priesnitz ( CPSO# 82422 )

Business Address:
Maple Clinic
D2 - 1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone Number: (613) 546-9721

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISHA ANN PRIESNITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIESNITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 17 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007