Priesol, Adrian James (CPSO#: 66474)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012