Prifti, Edvin Mihal (CPSO#: 81866)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universiteti i Tiranes, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2004 to 07 Nov 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Nov 2004 to 11 Mar 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2005