Prihar, Rajiv Kumar (CPSO#: 66674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 798-5660
Fax: (613) 725-9442
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJIV KUMAR PRIHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998