Primavesi, Robert (CPSO#: 61981)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000