Primeau, Valerie (CPSO#: 89492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE PRIMEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIMEAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 22 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 22 Jul 2011 to 21 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 22 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013