Prince, Douglas Arthur (CPSO#: 18706)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Prince Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 27 2012

Medical Records Location

Address: ODS PO Box 2071 Sudbury, ON P3A 4R8 Tel: 1-877-560-4637 or 705-560-8461 Fax: 705-524-8012 Email: odstorage@persona.ca Website: www.odstorage.com
Date Received: 02 Feb 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1963
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 May 2012