Prince, Garry Edward (CPSO#: 19296)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Dec 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Limited Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093 Fax: 1 888 316 4125
Date Received: 29 Mar 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1964
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Dec 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Garry Edward Prince to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 14, 2016.

Dr. Prince was the subject of College investigations into his practice. In particular, Dr. Prince was the subject of investigations into his standard of care and into breaches of his confirmation to Health Canada that he had relinquished some of his prescribing privileges. In the face of these investigations, Dr. Prince resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)