Prince, Gus Donald (CPSO#: 26587)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: Pristupa, Gustav Donald (used until: 09 Nov 1999 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2006