Pringle, Catherine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 60692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 4116
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8689
Fax: (613) 737-8857
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C.E. Pringle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pringle ( CPSO# 60692 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
4116 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8689

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELIZABETH PRINGLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRINGLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Aug 1993
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1993