Pringle, Derrick John (CPSO#: 68246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd East
London Ontario
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Price Pringle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pringle ( CPSO# 68246 )
Dr. L. Price ( CPSO# 73484 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Victoria Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Urgent Care
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DERRICK JOHN PRINGLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRINGLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999