Prior, Donald Frederick (CPSO#: 22073)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 3 Ingleview Drive Inglewood ON L7C 1P3
Date Received: 19 May 2016


Address: Patients may email Dr. Prior at dfprior.md@gmail.com to request copies of medical records.
Date Received: 18 Nov 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016