Pritchard, Kenneth Bruce (CPSO#: 71098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centennial Family Physicians
Suite 200
2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone: (613) 546-6652
Fax: (613) 344-1365
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth B. Pritchard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pritchard ( CPSO# 71098 )

Business Address:
Centennial Family Physicians
200 - 2437 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3G1
Phone Number: (613) 546-6652

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH BRUCE PRITCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRITCHARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999