Probizanski, David Charles (CPSO#: 71090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Medical Centre
63 North Algoma Street
suite 410
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone: (807) 344-0105
Fax: (807) 344-0135
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

901 Red River Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 1K3
Canada
Phone: (807) 344-3001
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Probizanski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Probizanski ( CPSO# 71090 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Medical Centre
410 - 63 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4Z6
Phone Number: (807) 344-0105

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES PROBIZANSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROBIZANSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999