Probst, Louis Ernest (CPSO#: 62198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Illinois
USA - Iowa
USA - Michigan
USA - Minnesota
USA - South Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS ERNEST PROBST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROBST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991