Proctor, Irma Joan (CPSO#: 57490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
42 Glen Allan Drive
Bridgewater NS  B4V 3N2
Phone: (902) 543-6882
Fax: (902) 543-3765

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRMA JOAN PROCTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROCTOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1994