Proctor, Monja Lea (CPSO#: 75423)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Univ of Texas Southwestern Med School, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002