Proctor, Wendey Joan Rachelle (CPSO#: 80779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara West Palliative Care Team
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone: 905-945-2250 Ext. 413
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDEY JOAN RACHELLE PROCTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROCTOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 12 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2006