Prokopetz, Robert Donald (CPSO#: 43545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gamma Dynacare Laboratory
750 Peter Morand Crescent
Ottawa ON  K1G 6S4
Phone: (613) 729-0200 Ext. 6602
Fax: (613) 249-0664
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Prokopetz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Prokopetz ( CPSO# 43545 )

Business Address:
Gamma Dynacare Laboratory
750 Peter Morand Crescent
Ottawa ON  K1G 4S6
Phone Number: (613) 729-0200

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 13 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DONALD PROKOPETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROKOPETZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1990