Prokopiw, Igor (CPSO#: 31187)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 May 2005