Promnitz, Michael (CPSO#: 65887)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
312 Woolwich St.
Guelph ON  N1H 3W3
Phone: (519) 827-1829
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Promnitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Promnitz ( CPSO# 65887 )

Business Address:
312 Woolwich Street
Guelph ON  N1H 3W3
Phone Number: (519) 827-1829

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PROMNITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROMNITZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 10 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1996