Propst, Lara Gill (CPSO#: 72580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Branson Division
5th Floor
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone: (416) 632-8703
Fax: (416) 632-8704
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARA GILL PROPST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROPST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2003