Pross, Diane Carol (CPSO#: 26847)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jul 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008