Protzner, Kalman (CPSO#: 58859)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 09 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1996