Proudlove, Steven Gary (CPSO#: 70260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
1 Centerpointe Drive
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 728-6660
Fax: (613) 728-6840
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven G. Proudlove Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Proudlove ( CPSO# 70260 )

Business Address:
303 - 1 Centerpointe Drive
Nepean ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 728-6660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN GARY PROUDLOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROUDLOVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2002