Proulx, Genevieve Christiane (CPSO#: 87361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Genevieve Proulx Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Proulx ( CPSO# 87361 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE CHRISTIANE PROULX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROULX is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2012