Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Proulx, Stephane (CPSO#: 66075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hôpital de Verdun
4000 Boul Lasalle
Verdun QC  H4G 2A3
Phone: (514) 362-1000 Ext. 62141
Fax: (514) 765-7306

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANE PROULX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROULX is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1992