Providence, Briana Danielle (CPSO#: 105119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Oct 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dresden Community Healthcare Centre
P O Box 479
530 Tecumseh Street
Dresden ON  N0P 1M0
Phone: (519) 683-4479
Fax: (519)683-2763
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Briana Danielle Providence Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Providence ( CPSO# 105119)

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Family Health Team
530 Tecumseh Street
Dresden ON  N0P 1M0
Phone Number: (519) 683-4479


Corporation Name: Glen K. Providence Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Providence ( CPSO# 105248)
Dr. B. Providence ( CPSO# 105119)

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
Chatham Campus
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
Dresden Community Healthcare Centre
P.O. Box 479
530 Tecumseh Street
Dresden ON  N0P 1M0
Phone Number: (519) 683-4479

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Apr 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2016 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Briana  Danielle  Providence  may practise medicine independently in
                  family medicine.