Provost, Ninon Marguerite Marie (CPSO#: 60646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinique Radiologie PB
Suite 107
3180 Chemin Chambly
Longueuil QC  J4L 1N6
Phone: (450) 646-3520
Fax: (450) 646-9884
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hawkesbury and District
General Hospital
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Canada
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

1333 Boulevard Jacques Cartier
Longueuil QC  J4M 2A5
Canada
Phone: (450) 468-8111
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NINON MARGUERITE MARIE PROVOST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROVOST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2004