Provost, Viviane (CPSO#: 92312)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2013