Prpic, Jason Claude (CPSO#: 73974)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Emergency Department
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4700
Fax: (705) 675-4794
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Espenola General Hospital
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Prpic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Prpic ( CPSO# 73974 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Emergency Deparment
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7500

Business Address:
202 - 7 Cedar Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 1A2
Phone Number: (705) 675-4783

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON CLAUDE PRPIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRPIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2002 to 17 Nov 2002
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2001