Prud'Homme, Jane Marie (CPSO#: 61122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesiology
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7777 Ext. 8187
Fax: (613) 737-8189
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1910 St Laurent blvd
Unit 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: 6136866656
Fax: 6132489009
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. M. Prud'Homme Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Prud'Homme ( CPSO# 61122 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Department of Anaesthesiology
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE MARIE PRUD'HOMME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRUD'HOMME is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1990