Prud'homme, Pierre Timothy (CPSO#: 72410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-7878 Ext. 2777
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pierre Prud'homme Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Prud'homme ( CPSO# 72410 )

Business Address:
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-7878

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE TIMOTHY PRUD'HOMME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRUD'HOMME is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003