Prupas, David Robert (CPSO#: 59960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
19 Malard Street
Dollard Des Ormeaux QC  H9A 3G9
Phone: (514) 626-0394
Fax: (514) 626-0597
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5690 Cavendish
Cote Saint Luc QC  H4W 1S7
Canada
Phone: (514) 369-2222
County: 
Electoral District: 

1335 Pitt Street
Cornwall ON  K6J 3T7
Canada
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT PRUPAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRUPAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1989