Prussick, Ronald (CPSO#: 58478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6163 Executive Blvd
N. Bethesda MD  20852
United States
Phone: (301) 984-3000
Fax: (301) 984-3001
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

61B Thomas Johnson Drive
Frederick MD  20817
United States
Phone: (301) 694-9500
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 14 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD PRUSSICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRUSSICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1988