Prysiazny, Brian Keith (CPSO#: 51396)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone: (905)945-2253 Ext. 323
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Prysiazny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Prysiazny ( CPSO# 51396 )

Business Address:
1928 Haist Street
RR1
Ridgeville ON  L0S 1M0
Phone Number: (905) 892-1998

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
167 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P2
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN KEITH PRYSIAZNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRYSIAZNY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984